O'Donnell, Martin James (CPSO#: 74528)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2000 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Geriatric Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Geriatric Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Geriatric Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 31 Jan 2003
Clinical Fellow - Geriatric Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Feb 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jan 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 Feb 2003
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Dec 2003
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 05 Feb 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 13 Mar 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 05 Aug 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 31 Dec 2009