O'Donoghue, Rory (CPSO#: 96997)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 21 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 21 Jul 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Appletree Medical Group Suite 210 1902 Robertson Road Ottawa, ON K2H 5B8
Date Received: 11 Jun 2014

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Nov 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Sep 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Jul 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 21 Jul 2014