O'Grady, Melanie Dawn (CPSO#: 93276)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 202
66 Josephine
North Bay ON  P1B 0A7
Phone: (705) 474-1441
Fax: (705) 474-1137
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Melanie O'Grady Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 20 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. M. O'Grady ( CPSO# 93276 )

Business Address:
Suite 202
66 Josephine Street
North Bay ON  P1B 0A7
Phone Number: (705) 474-1441

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 25 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MELANIE DAWN O'GRADY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. O'GRADY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 2012