O'Keefe, Andrew William (CPSO#: 94793)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Sep 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Sep 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Clinical Immunology and Allergy Effective: 27 Oct 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 06 Feb 2011 to 06 Mar 2011
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 19 Sep 2011 to 14 Oct 2011
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2013 to 30 Sep 2013
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Clinical Immunology and Allergy

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Feb 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 Mar 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Oct 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2013