O'Malley, Lauren Grace (CPSO#: 95586)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Aug 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Aug 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 18 Jul 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LAUREN GRACE O'MALLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. O'MALLEY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 21 Jul 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 22 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 18 Jul 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 19 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2018 to 18 Jul 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Jul 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 2018