O'Malley, Lauren Kate (CPSO#: 93379)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Nov 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Carmen Vanderwater Medical Centre
180 Parsons Road
Suite 33
Alliston ON  L9R1E8
Phone: (705) 435-0391
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lauren O'Malley Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 14 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. L. O'Malley ( CPSO# 93379 )

Business Address:
Carmen Vanderwater Medical Centre
180 Parsons Road
Suite 33
Alliston ON  L9R 1E8
Phone Number: (705) 435-0391

Business Address:
105 Quarry Ridge Road
Suite 5
Barrie ON  L4M 7G1
Phone Number: (705) 503-6333

Business Address:
200 Fletcher Crescent
P.O. Box 4000
Alliston ON  L9R 1W7
Phone Number: (705) 435-6281

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Stevenson Memorial Hospital Alliston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 03 Nov 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LAUREN KATE O'MALLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. O'MALLEY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 03 Nov 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 04 Nov 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 03 Nov 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Nov 2015