O'Neill, Michelle Elyse (CPSO#: 85450)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Aug 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Aug 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2006 to 31 Jul 2007
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 2006
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Aug 2007