O'Shea, Anne-Marie (CPSO#: 82243)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Aug 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Aug 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University College of Dublin, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Feb 2005 to 25 Apr 2005
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 26 Apr 2005 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 Aug 2007
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 08 Mar 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Apr 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 May 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2007