Oakton, Suzannah Elizabeth (CPSO#: 97644)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Nottingham, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Homewood Health Centre 150 Delhi Street Guelph, ON N1T 2G4
Date Received: 19 Apr 2016

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Kingdom

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Aug 2012 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 Jun 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Jun 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 29 Apr 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 06 Sep 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Sep 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016