Obaji, James (CPSO#: 95003)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 May 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:American University of the Caribbean, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 306
474 College Street
Toronto ON  M6G 1A4
Phone: (416) 967-9368
Fax: (416) 967-7385
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: H. Obaji Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 05 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Obaji ( CPSO# 54496 )
Dr. J. Obaji ( CPSO# 95003 )

Business Address:
Suite 304
474 College Street
Toronto ON  M6G 1A4
Phone Number: (416) 588-6660


Corporation Name: Dr. James Obaji Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 07 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Obaji ( CPSO# 95003 )

Business Address:
Suite 306
474 College Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1A4
Phone Number: (416) 967-9368

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 29 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAMES OBAJI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OBAJI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 05 May 2011 to 15 Jun 2011
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 16 Jun 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
Elective Trainee - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 May 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011