Oberoi, Malika (CPSO#: 85183)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Hindi

Education:University of Sherbrooke, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
530 Fred Street
Suite E
Winchester ON  K0C 2K0
Phone: (613) 239-2165
Fax: (613) 239-2167
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Malika Oberoi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 24 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Oberoi ( CPSO# 85183 )

Business Address:
Unit E
530 Fred Street
Winchester ON  K0C 2K0
Phone Number: (613) 239-2165

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MALIKA OBEROI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OBEROI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011