Obillo-Tumaneng, Edna Elaine (CPSO#: 75737)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 03 Dec 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 03 Dec 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Filipino

Education:University of the Philippines, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 29 Oct 2002
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Apr 2003 to 01 Oct 2003
International Specialist Physician - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Oct 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Oct 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Oct 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Dec 2003
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 06 Aug 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Dec 2008