Oczkowski, Simon John Walsh (CPSO#: 90622)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jul 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Juravinski Hospital
Room A3-20
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 42446
Fax: (905) 389-9849
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Legault & Oczkowski Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 24 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Legault ( CPSO# 86543 )
Dr. S. Oczkowski ( CPSO# 90622 )

Business Address:
Juravinski Hospital
Room A3-20
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3

Business Address:
Juravinski Hospital
Room A3-14
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 23 Sep 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SIMON JOHN WALSH OCZKOWSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OCZKOWSKI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Critical Care Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 2013