Odame, Isaac (CPSO#: 75645)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jan 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Academic Practice as of 01 Jan 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Akan, English, Ga

Education:Univ of Ghana, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Division of Hematology/Oncology
The Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-6194
Fax: (416) 813-5327
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 25 Oct 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ISAAC ODAME may practise medicine only in a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the DIVISION OF HAEMATOLOGY/ONCOLOGY, DEPARTMENT OF PAEDIATRICS, UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO in which Dr. ODAME holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment at the rank of full or associate professor;

(2) Dr. ODAME may practise medicine only to the extent required by the teaching or research requirements of the appointment referred to in clause (1);

(3) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:

(i) When Dr. ODAME no longer holds certification by the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada or the College of Family Physicians of Canada,

(ii) When Dr. ODAME no longer holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment to the academic staff of an accredited medical school in Ontario at the rank of full or associate professor,

(iii) When Dr. ODAME no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

NOTE: The expiry date of this certificate is as explained above.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 08 Sep 2000
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 11 Aug 2001
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 12 Jul 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2007