Odell, Michael Jeffery (CPSO#: 79966)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jun 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
501 Smyth Rd - Module O
Department of Otolaryngology
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8899 Ext. 73287
Fax: (613) 739-6831
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Michael Odell Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 26 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Odell ( CPSO# 79966 )

Business Address:
501 Smyth Road - Module 0
Department of Otolaryngology
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8899

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL JEFFERY ODELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ODELL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 2003
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 26 Jun 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2009