Odrcich, Mark John Joseph (CPSO#: 76156)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Windsor Regional Hospital
Metropolitan Campus
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Phone: (519) 254-5577
Electoral District: 01
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Windsor Regional Hospital
Ouellette Campus
1030 Ouellette Ave.
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Canada
Phone: (519) 973 4411
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

194 Talbot West
Leamington District Memorial Hosp
Leamington ON  N8H 1N9
Canada
Phone: (519) 326-2373
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

Hotel-Dieu Grace Healthcare
1453 Prince Rd
Windsor ON  N9C 3Z4
Canada
Phone: (519) 258-5111
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

860 Tecumseh Rd E #200
Windsor Ontario
Windsor ON  N8X4E7
Canada
Phone: 519 258 1231
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Vasey Odrcich Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 11 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Vasey ( CPSO# 77847 )
Dr. M. Odrcich ( CPSO# 76156 )

Business Address:
1453 Prince Road
Windsor ON  N9C 3Z4

Business Address:
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Phone Number: (519) 254-5577

Business Address:
194 Talbot West
Leamington ON  N8H 1N9
Phone Number: (519) 326-2373

Business Address:
Windsor Regional Hospital
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Phone Number: (519) 254-5577

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Erie Shores HealthCare Leamington
Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare,Tayfour Campus Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARK JOHN JOSEPH ODRCICH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ODRCICH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2001 to 31 Mar 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Apr 2002 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Sep 2006 to 31 Aug 2007
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2006