Ogaick, Maurice James Karim (CPSO#: 94733)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 10 Aug 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 10 Aug 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 11 Jan 2011 to 31 Jan 2011
Elective Trainee - Thoracic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Feb 2011 to 28 Feb 2011
Elective Trainee - Surgical Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Feb 2012 to 29 Feb 2012
Elective Trainee - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2012 to 30 Mar 2012
Elective Trainee - Surgical Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jan 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Feb 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Mar 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 10 Aug 2015