Ogborn, Malcolm Robert (CPSO#: 72707)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 24 Aug 2001

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 24 Aug 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Adelaide, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 19 Nov 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1998
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 11 Jul 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 16 Aug 1999
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 21 Aug 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Aug 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 19 Aug 2001
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 24 Aug 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 24 Aug 2001