Ogunyankin, Kofoworola Olufunsho (CPSO#: 76004)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Yoruba

Education:University of Lagos, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ogunyankin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 22 2007

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 10 May 2001
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 08 May 2002
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 10 May 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2007