Oinonen, Ervin Theodore (CPSO#: 26024)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 19 Sep 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 19 Sep 2016

Summary

Date of Death: 21-Oct-2016

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Finnish

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Oinonen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 21 2010

Medical Records Location

Address: c/o Dr. Tsai 'Tony' Yu 9 Court Street St. Catharines ON L2R 4R3
Date Received: 18 Nov 2016

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 19 Sep 2016