Okon, Marquis Moses Aniedi-Abasi (CPSO#: 80434)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Jan 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jan 2004

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Ibibio

Education:University of Ibadan, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 6
261 Martindale Road
St Catharines ON  L2W 1A1
Phone: (905) 682-4534
Fax: (905) 682-6281
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Marquis Okon Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 26 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Okon ( CPSO# 80434 )

Business Address:
Unit # 6
261 Martindale Road
St Catharines ON  L2W 1A1
Phone Number: (905) 682-4534

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System,Welland County General Site Welland

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 01 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARQUIS MOSES ANIEDI-ABASI OKON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OKON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jan 2004

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: April 13, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person and a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)