Okrainec, Allan Eric Peter Philip (CPSO#: 74996)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Jan 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jan 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Western Hospital
Main Pavillion 8-325
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5224
Fax: (416) 603-5991
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Toronto General Hospital
10EN-217
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Canada
Phone: 416-340-3573
Fax: 416-340-3808
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Women's College Hospital
Suite 8333
76 Grenville street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Canada
Phone: 416-323-7712
Fax: 416-323-7710
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Allan Okrainec Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 1 2017


Corporation Name: Dr. Allan Okrainec Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 28 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Okrainec ( CPSO# 74996 )

Business Address:
Suite 8333
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone Number: (416) 323-7712

Business Address:
Toronto Western Hospital
Main Pavillion 8-325
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5224

Business Address:
Suite 10EN-217
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-3573

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALLAN ERIC PETER PHILIP OKRAINEC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OKRAINEC is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jan 2006