Okusanya, Olanrewaju Olatunji (CPSO#: 85441)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jul 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Yoruba

Education:University of Ibadan, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1476 Aldersbrook Road
London ON  N6G 0P5
Phone: (519)4747300
Fax: (519)4747309
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

200 Fletcher Crescent,
Alliston ON  L9R1W7
Canada
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

395 Southdale Road. East
London ON  N6E 1A2
Canada
Phone: (519) 691-0100
Fax: (519) 691-1172
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

395 Carrie St, Strathroy,
Strathroy ON  N7G 3E2
Canada
Phone: (519) 245-5295
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

1299 Oxford Street East
London ON  N5Y 4W5
Canada
Phone: 5192046204
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Ireland

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. OLANREWAJU OLATUNJI OKUSANYA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OKUSANYA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 21 Aug 2006 to 31 Oct 2006
Assessment Verification Period - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2006 to 20 Aug 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 21 Aug 2007 to 20 Aug 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 21 Aug 2008 to 20 Aug 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 21 Aug 2009 to 20 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 21 Aug 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 Dec 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Dec 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 2013