Ola, Ebele Iyadunni (CPSO#: 75061)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Mar 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Walking Mobility Clinics
Ground Floor
Suite 11
750 Dundas Street West
Toronto ON  M5T 2S6
Phone: (416) 929-1015
Fax: (416) 929-9918
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 2002 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EBELE IYADUNNI OLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OLA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Mar 2003