Ola, Foluso Ayomitunde Olusegun (CPSO#: 81417)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Jun 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2004

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Benin, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Bioflax Medical Centre,
Unit 6, 121 Highway 20 East
Fonthill ON  L0S 1E0
Phone: (905) 892-7728
Fax: (905) 892-7811
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Foluso A. Ola Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 02 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Ola ( CPSO# 81417 )

Business Address:
6 - 121 Highway 20 East
Fonthill ON  L0S 1E0
Phone Number: (905) 892-7728

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Newfoundland and Labrador

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System Port Colborne General Site Port Colborne

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 03 Dec 2003 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FOLUSO AYOMITUNDE OLUSEGUN OLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OLA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2004

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: May 18, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)