Olberg, Bernhard Johan (CPSO#: 42826)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Dutch, English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 501 Smyth Road, Ottawa, Ontario K1H 8L6
Date Received: 01 Jun 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 13 Dec 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1980
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1981
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018