Olejarova, Emilia (CPSO#: 80324)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Oct 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Oct 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Czech, English, Slovak

Education:Univerzity P.J. Safarika, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Brantford General Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9
Phone: (519) 751-5544 Ext. 2481
Fax: (519) 751-5543
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Olejarova Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 01 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Olejarova ( CPSO# 80324 )

Business Address:
Brantford General Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9
Phone Number: (519) 751-5544

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 01 Sep 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EMILIA OLEJAROVA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OLEJAROVA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Dec 2003 to 01 Jun 2004
International Specialist Physician - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 02 Jun 2004 to 30 Jul 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 Aug 2005
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 01 Aug 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Oct 2009