Oliphant, Lawrie David (CPSO#: 51310)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: ODS P.O. Box 2071 Subury ON P3A 4R8
Date Received: 17 May 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 26 Jun 1986 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 13 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018