Olisa, Obidike Molokwu (CPSO#: 94324)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Sep 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Sep 2010

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Benin, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Village Clinic
101 Thompsons Road
Penetanguishene ON  L9M 0V3
Phone: (705) 300-0016
Fax: (888) 972-1952
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

The Simcoe Clinic
Unit 2
279 Yonge St.
Barrie ON  L4N 7T9
Canada
Phone: (705) 728-8860
Fax: (705) 737-4733
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Olisa Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 03 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. O. Olisa ( CPSO# 94324 )

Business Address:
The Simcoe Clinic
Suite 2
279 Yonge Street
Barrie ON  L4N 7T9
Phone Number: (705) 728-8860

Business Address:
The Village Clinic
101 Thompsons Road
Penetanguishene ON  L9M 0V3
Phone Number: (705) 300-0016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Oct 2010 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Sep 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 29 Feb 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Feb 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Feb 2012

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 17 Feb 2012 Active View Details [+]
                  Dr.  Obidike  Molokwu Olisa may practise medicine independently in Family
                  Medicine, only.