Oliveira, Liliana Margarida (CPSO#: 81528)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Portuguese

Education:University of Ottawa, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 29
1910 St Laurent Boulevard
Ottawa ON  K1G 1A4
Phone: (613) 686-6656
Fax: (613) 248-9009
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. L. Oliveira Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 14 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Oliveira ( CPSO# 81528 )

Business Address:
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone Number: (613) 746-4621

Business Address:
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 722-7000

Business Address:
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 798-5555

Business Address:
Unit 29
1910 St Laurent Boulevard
Ottawa ON  K1G 1A4
Phone Number: (613) 686-6656

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Montfort Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 20 Oct 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LILIANA MARGARIDA OLIVEIRA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OLIVEIRA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 01 Aug 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 02 Aug 2005 to 01 Aug 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 02 Aug 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 2008