Oliver, Matthew James (CPSO#: 66439)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Kidney Centre at CNIB
Room 388
1929 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4G 3E8
Phone: (416) 480-5590
Fax: (416) 480-4245
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M.J. Oliver Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 27 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Oliver ( CPSO# 66439 )

Business Address:
Kidney Care Centre at CNIB
Room 388
1289 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4G 3E8

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 10 Sep 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MATTHEW JAMES OLIVER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OLIVER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Nephrology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 5 - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1997