Oliver, Steven William (CPSO#: 76805)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Aug 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Aug 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 3
3570 Strandherd Drive
Nepean ON  K2J 5L4
Phone: (613) 823-4991
Fax: (613) 823-6221
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Steven W. Oliver Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 2 2015


Corporation Name: Dr. Steven W. Oliver Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 16 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Oliver ( CPSO# 76805 )

Business Address:
3 - 3570 Strandherd Drive
Nepean ON  K2J 5L4
Phone Number: (613) 823-4991

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brockville General Hospital Brockville
Kemptville District Hospital Kemptville
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEVEN WILLIAM OLIVER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OLIVER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 04 Aug 2005
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Aug 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Aug 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 02 Aug 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 2006