Olivier, Patricia (CPSO#: 89885)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 03 Aug 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 03 Aug 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Laval University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 17 Sep 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Oct 2008 to 30 Sep 2009
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jan 2009
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Aug 2010