Omar, Amer Alaa Mostafa Kamal (CPSO#: 90037)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Sep 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Sep 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French

Education:Queen's University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Eye Health MD
8000 Blvd Decarie
Montreal, Quebec
Montreal QC  H4P 2S4
Phone: (514) 340-3937

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec
United Kingdom

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AMER ALAA MOSTAFA KAMAL OMAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OMAR is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Nov 2008
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Aug 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Sep 2011