Omiwole, Olufemi Olaniyi (CPSO#: 80027)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 29 Mar 2018

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Yoruba

Education:University of Ife, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 3, 196 King Street East
Bowmanville ON  L1C 1P1
Phone: (905) 697-8300
Fax: (905) 697-8264
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Prime Care Medical Centre
West Lynde Plaza
Unit B7
965 Dundas Street West
Whitby ON  L1P 1G8
Canada
Phone: (905) 217-0040
Fax: (905) 217-0082
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Omiwole Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 10 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. O. Omiwole ( CPSO# 80027 )

Business Address:
3 - 196 King Street East
Bowmanville ON  L1C 1P1
Phone Number: (905) 697-8300

Business Address:
Prime Care Medical Centre
West Lynde Plaza
B7 - 965 Dundas Street West
Whitby ON  L1P 1G8
Phone Number: (905) 217-0040

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Jun 2003 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 29 Mar 2018
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 29 Mar 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 29 Mar 2018 Active View Details [+]
            As from March 29, 2018, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Olufemi Olaniyi
            Omiwole, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Omiwole to
            the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of
                  
                              DR. OLUFEMI OLANIYI OMIWOLE
                                          ("Dr. Omiwole")
                  
                                                to 
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "Discipline Committee" means the Discipline Committee of the College;
                  
                  "NMS" means the Narcotics Monitoring System implemented under the
                  Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010, S.O. 2010, c. 22, as amended;
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public. 
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Omiwole, certificate of registration number 80027, am a member of
                  the College.  

            (3)   I, Dr. Omiwole, acknowledge that the College has received information
                  regarding my standard of practice and that the College is conducting an
                  investigation, bearing file number 105118, into the information.

            (4)   I, Dr. Omiwole, acknowledge that the College has accepted this
                  Undertaking in lieu of making an Order under section 25.4 of the Code at
                  this time.

            (5)   I, Dr. Omiwole, acknowledge that this Undertaking does not preclude the
                  ICR Committee from making an order at a later date in accordance with the
                  Code.

            (6)   I, Dr. Omiwole, acknowledge that this Undertaking continues in force
                  until the matters currently being investigated are disposed of by a panel
                  of the ICR Committee or the Discipline Committee.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (7)   I, Dr. Omiwole, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
                  effective immediately ("Effective Date").

            (8)   Clinical Supervision 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Omiwole, undertake to practise under the guidance of a
                        clinical supervisor(s) acceptable to the College (the "Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)"), ("Clinical Supervision"). 
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Omiwole, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)'s undertaking, attached hereto as Appendix "A", and
                        understand what is required of the Clinical Supervisor(s). The
                        Clinical Supervisor(s) will, at minimum: 
                  
                        (i)   Meet with me at my Practice Location, or another location
                              approved by the College, once every two (2) weeks;
                  
                        (ii)  Review at least twenty (20) of my patient charts at every
                              meeting, ten (10) of which will come from my walk-in
                              practice, with a focus on patients with chronic illness, and
                              ten (10) of which will come from my family practice. The
                              patient charts shall be selected by the Clinical
                              Supervisor(s) independent of my participation, on the basis
                              of the areas of concern identified in the medical inspector's
                              report, received by the College October 24, 2017, and any
                              concerns that arise during the period of Clinical
                              Supervision;
                  
                        (iii) Discuss any concerns arising from the chart reviews;
                  
                        (iv)  Perform any other duties, such as reviewing other documents
                              or conducting interviews with staff or colleagues, that the
                              Clinical Supervisor(s) deem necessary to my Clinical
                              Supervision; and
                  
                        (v)   Submit written reports to the College at least once every
                              month, or more frequently if the Clinical Supervisor(s) has
                              concerns about my standard of practice.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Omiwole, acknowledge that the charts reviewed shall be
                        selected by the Clinical Supervisor(s) based on the areas of
                        concern identified in the report of the medical inspector received
                        by the College October 24, 2017, and concerns that may arise during
                        the period of Clinical Supervision.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Omiwole, undertake to cooperate fully with the Clinical
                        Supervision of my practice, conducted under the term of this
                        Undertaking and Appendix "A" attached, and to abide by the
                        recommendations of my Clinical Supervisor(s).
                  (e)   I, Dr. Omiwole, undertake to ensure that Appendix "A" to this
                        Undertaking, is signed and delivered to the College within thirty
                        (30) days of the date I execute this Undertaking.
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Omiwole, undertake that if a person who has given an
                        undertaking in Appendix "A" to this Undertaking is unable or
                        unwilling to continue to fulfill its provisions, I shall, within
                        twenty (20) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed
                        undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who
                        is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the
                        College within that time.
                  
                  (g)   I, Dr. Omiwole, acknowledge that if I am unable to obtain a
                        Clinical Supervisor on the provisions set out under sections (8)(e)
                        and/or (f) above, I will cease practising medicine until such time
                        as I have obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.  
                  
                  (h)   I, Dr. Omiwole, acknowledge that if I am required to cease practise
                        as a result of section (8)(g) above this will constitute a term,
                        condition or limitation on my Certificate of Registration and that
                        term, condition or limitation will be included on the public
                        register.
                  
            (9)   I, Dr. Omiwole, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                  location that I practise or have privileges, including, but not limited
                  to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any jurisdiction
                  (collectively my "Practice Location(s)"), within five (5) days of
                  executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I further undertake to inform
                  the College of any and all new Practice Locations within five (5) days of
                  commencing practice at that location.

            (10)  I, Dr. Omiwole, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere with,
                  unannounced inspections of my Practice Location(s) and and to any other
                  activity the College deems necessary in order to monitor my compliance
                  with the provisions of this Undertaking.

            (11)  I, Dr. Omiwole, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee.

            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (12)  I, Dr. Omiwole, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred
                  to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (13)  I, Dr. Omiwole, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
                  responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
                  arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
                  Undertaking. 

            (14)  I, Dr. Omiwole, acknowledge that I have read and understand the
                  provisions of Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal
                  counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my
                  right to do so.

            (15)  I, Dr. Omiwole, acknowledge that the College will provide this
                  Undertaking to any Chief(s) of Staff, or a colleague with similar
                  responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff").

            (16)  I, Dr. Omiwole, acknowledge that, in the event of a referral to the
                  Discipline Committee and in the event of an appeal of any Order of the
                  Discipline Committee, if the Discipline Committee has directed the
                  Registrar to revoke, suspend, or impose terms and conditions on my
                  certificate of registration, that Order will take effect immediately
                  despite any appeal.

            (17)  I, Dr. Omiwole, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (18)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Omiwole, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Omiwole, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with section (18)(a) above, the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                              The College has received information regarding Dr. Omiwole's 
                              standard of practice and that the College is conducting an 
                              investigation into the information. During the investigation 
                              and in the event of a referral to the Discipline Committee:
                  
                              Dr. Omiwole must practise under the guidance of a Clinical 
                              Supervisor acceptable to the College. 
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (19)  I, Dr. Omiwole, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                  appropriate enquiries of OHIP, the Drug Program Services Branch, NMS
                  and/or any person who or institution that may have relevant information,
                  in order for the College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of
                  this Undertaking. 

            (20)  I, Dr. Omiwole, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP and NMS consent
                  form(s), attached hereto as Appendix "B" and Appendix "C", respectively. 

            (21)  I, Dr. Omiwole, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the
                  following information to all Clinical Supervisors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (22)  I, Dr. Omiwole, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all
                  Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has that led to the
                  circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information
                  arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

            (23)  I, Dr. Omiwole, give my irrevocable consent to all Clinical Supervisors
                  and Chiefs of Staff to disclose to the College, and to one another, any
                  information:

                  (a)   relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   relevant to the provisions of the Clinical Supervisor's undertaking
                        set out at Appendix "A"; and/or
                  
                  (c)   relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this
                        Undertaking. 
                  

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: March 29, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Olufemi Olaniyi Omiwole to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario effective March 29, 2018:

The College has received information regarding Dr. Omiwole’s standard of practice and that the College is conducting an investigation into the information. During the investigation and in the event of a referral to the Discipline Committee:

Dr. Omiwole must practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.