Omotoye, Samuel Adewale (CPSO#: 88896)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Aug 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Lagos, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University of Toronto
Postgraduate Medical Education
500 University Avenue Suite 602
Toronto ON  M5G 1V7
Phone: (416) 978-6976
Fax: (416) 978-7144
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Samuel Omotoye Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 4 2015

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Ohio

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SAMUEL ADEWALE OMOTOYE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OMOTOYE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 23 Sep 2008
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 2012