Ondhia, Manharlai Vanmalibhai (CPSO#: 28942)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati

Education:English Conjoint Board, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: NTEC 7155 Woodbine Avenue Markham ON M3R 1A3
Date Received: 25 Apr 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 13 Mar 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jan 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018