Onochie, Chinedu Peter Ifeanyichukwu (CPSO#: 81165)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 2010

Summary

Former Name: Onochie, Chinedu Ifeanyi Peter (used until: 08 Jul 2010 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
6497 Jeanne D'Arc Boulevard N
Orleans ON  K1C 2R1
Phone: (613) 841-8500
Fax: (613) 841-5310
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

104 - 10 Green St
Ottawa ON  K2J 3Z6
Canada
Phone: (613) 825-0544
Fax: (613) 825-0543
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Chinedu Onochie Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 27 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Onochie ( CPSO# 81165 )

Business Address:
104 - 10 Green Street
Ottawa ON  K2J 3Z6
Phone Number: (613) 825-0544

Business Address:
6497 Jeanne D'Arc Boulevard North
Orleans ON  K1C 2R1
Phone Number: (613) 841-8500

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec
USA - Michigan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHINEDU PETER IFEANYICHUKWU ONOCHIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ONOCHIE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Aug 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Sep 2006 to 31 Aug 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Sep 2007 to 31 Aug 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 2010