Onyett-Jeffries, Katherine Alexandra Gloria (CPSO#: 90985)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Crosstown Family Health Team
1286 Weston Road
Toronto, Ontario
Toronto ON  M6M 4R3
Phone: 416-242-2850
Fax: 888-283-8072
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Katherine Onyett-Jeffries Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 11 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Onyett-Jeffries ( CPSO# 90985 )

Business Address:
1286 Weston Road
Toronto ON  M6M 4R3
Phone Number: (416) 242-2850

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 29 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KATHERINE ALEXANDRA GLORIA ONYETT-JEFFRIES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ONYETT-JEFFRIES is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011