Opris, Alexandru Antoniu Felician (CPSO#: 51315)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Sep 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Romanian

Education:University of Cluj, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Yorkville Vein Clinic
404 - 1240 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5R 2A7
Phone: (416) 927-0533
Fax: (416) 927-8897
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

St Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALEXANDRU ANTONIU FELICIAN OPRIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OPRIS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1982 to 15 Jun 1983
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Other - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 1984
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Apr 2003
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 30 Apr 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2005