Opryszczko, Krzysztof Tomasz (CPSO#: 89989)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Nov 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Oct 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:Bialystok University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Algoma District Medical Group
240 McNabb Street
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 1Y5
Phone: (705) 759-1234
Fax: (705) 759-7460
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Fera Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 27 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Jenkins ( CPSO# 99889 )
Dr. W. Chung ( CPSO# 99567 )
Dr. W. Wallace ( CPSO# 92960 )
Dr. J. DellaVedova ( CPSO# 91071 )
Dr. J. Patterson ( CPSO# 91088 )
Dr. M. Hemy ( CPSO# 86777 )
Dr. K. Opryszczko ( CPSO# 89989 )
Dr. J. Bishop ( CPSO# 96910 )
Dr. E. Hirvi ( CPSO# 84322 )
Dr. A. Schamp ( CPSO# 82979 )
Dr. J. Keuhl ( CPSO# 88070 )
Dr. C. Kuntz ( CPSO# 84476 )
Dr. P. Ciaschini ( CPSO# 52948 )
Dr. S. Buehner ( CPSO# 65582 )
Dr. D. Brooks ( CPSO# 26921 )
Dr. C. Bruni ( CPSO# 55651 )
Dr. S. Allen ( CPSO# 73014 )
Dr. D. Burrows ( CPSO# 50233 )
Dr. P. Bragaglia ( CPSO# 33769 )
Dr. S. Bondar ( CPSO# 59698 )
Dr. E. Barrett ( CPSO# 56931 )
Dr. A. Fam ( CPSO# 62586 )
Dr. M. Edwards ( CPSO# 52889 )
Dr. D. Fera ( CPSO# 33299 )
Dr. S. Fratesi ( CPSO# 27368 )
Dr. D. Fritz ( CPSO# 60812 )
Dr. M. Hackett ( CPSO# 33820 )
Dr. H. Gupta ( CPSO# 78301 )
Dr. M. Keating ( CPSO# 57489 )
Dr. C. Kobelka ( CPSO# 62567 )
Dr. M. Lee ( CPSO# 62320 )
Dr. M. Leahy ( CPSO# 57088 )
Dr. J. Lane ( CPSO# 61549 )
Dr. M. Mathew ( CPSO# 44024 )
Dr. D. Micomonaco ( CPSO# 80815 )
Dr. M. Mogharrabi ( CPSO# 57473 )
Dr. B. Mitchell ( CPSO# 59931 )
Dr. J. Reich ( CPSO# 73103 )
Dr. C. Rossi ( CPSO# 51523 )
Dr. J. Stewart ( CPSO# 72520 )
Dr. K. Taylor ( CPSO# 75094 )
Dr. B. Slagel ( CPSO# 79472 )
Dr. M. Wilson ( CPSO# 69274 )
Dr. G. Yee ( CPSO# 70560 )
Dr. R. Wytsma ( CPSO# 52032 )
Dr. K. Zufelt ( CPSO# 67007 )
Dr. P. Zehr ( CPSO# 59997 )
Dr. L. Bonder ( CPSO# 90576 )

Business Address:
240 McNabb Street
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 1Y5
Phone Number: (705) 759-5540

Business Address:
170 East Street
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 3C6
Phone Number: (705) 759-5540

Business Address:
955 Queen Street East
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 2C3
Phone Number: (705) 549-5540

Business Address:
974 Queen Street East
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 2C2
Phone Number: (705) 759-5540

Business Address:
773 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 5K7
Phone Number: (705) 759-5540


Corporation Name: Opryszczko Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 30 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Opryszczko ( CPSO# 89989 )

Business Address:
Algoma District Medical Group
240 McNabb Street
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 1Y5
Phone Number: (705) 759-1234

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Oct 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KRZYSZTOF TOMASZ OPRYSZCZKO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OPRYSZCZKO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Nov 2008 to 23 Jan 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Jan 2009 to 31 Oct 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Nov 2009 to 01 Nov 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jan 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Oct 2010