Opyr, Oksana Lubomyrivna (CPSO#: 89767)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jan 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jan 2011

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Ukrainian

Education:Danylo Halytsky Lviv State Med Univ, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Winston Park Family Physicians
Suite 104
2315 Bristol Circle
Oakville ON  L6M 6P8
Phone: (905) 829-2826
Fax: (905) 829-2846
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

767 Royal York Rd
Ontario
Toronto ON  M8Y 2T3
Canada
Phone: 4162397365
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Opyr Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 08 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. O. Opyr ( CPSO# 89767 )

Business Address:
767 Royal York Road
Etobicoke ON  M8Y 2T3
Phone Number: (416) 239-7365

Business Address:
Winston Park Family Physicians
Suite 104
2315 Bristol Circle
Oakville ON  L6M 6P8
Phone Number: (905) 829-2826

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Dec 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. OKSANA LUBOMYRIVNA OPYR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OPYR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 02 Sep 2008 to 24 Nov 2008
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 25 Nov 2008 to 01 Sep 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 02 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 01 Sep 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Nov 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Sep 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Oct 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Jan 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jan 2011

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: August 15, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)