Oraif, Ayman Mohammed Kheder (CPSO#: 90162)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 04 Aug 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 04 Aug 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology & Infertility Effective: 31 Dec 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jan 2009 to 11 Feb 2009
Elective Trainee - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 11 Mar 2010 to 07 Apr 2010
Elective Trainee - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology & Infertility

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 6 - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology & Infertility

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 7 - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology & Infertility

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 7 - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology & Infertility

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology & Infertility

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology & Infertility

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jan 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Feb 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Mar 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 Apr 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Aug 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Aug 2012
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 Aug 2015