Ordon, Michael Howard (CPSO#: 82964)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
9th Floor
Suite 103
61 Queen Street East
Toronto ON  M5C 2T2
Phone: (416) 867-3705
Fax: (416) 867-7433
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Ordon Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 30 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Ordon ( CPSO# 82964 )

Business Address:
9th Floor
Suite 103
61 Queen Street East
Toronto ON  M5C 2T2
Phone Number: (416) 867-3705

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL HOWARD ORDON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ORDON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010