Organ Shin, Jennifer (CPSO#: 77982)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: Shin, Jennifer Lee (used until: 04 Jul 2005 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 509
2000 Credit Valley Road
Mississauga ON  L5M 4N4
Phone: (905) 607-9926
Fax: (905) 607-9896
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Organ Shin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 07 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Organ Shin ( CPSO# 77982 )

Business Address:
Unit 183
2225 Erin Mills Parkway
Mississauga ON  L5K 1T9
Phone Number: (905) 823-0223

Business Address:
Suite 509
2000 Credit Valley Road
Mississauga ON  L5M 4N4
Phone Number: (905) 607-9926

Business Address:
Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-1100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 May 2007 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 07 Oct 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JENNIFER ORGAN SHIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ORGAN SHIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 29 Feb 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 2007