Orlov, Steven Rostislav (CPSO#: 93154)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Russian

Education:University of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Polyclinic Specialty Medicine
2 Champagne Dr, Unit B17
Toronto ON  M3J 2C5
Phone: 416-222-6160 Ext. 269
Fax: 416-645-1978
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

CannaMed Clinic
19-1118 Centre Street
Thornhill ON  L4J 7R9
Canada
Phone: 905-479-9902
Fax: 905-649-3762
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. S. Orlov Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 10 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Orlov ( CPSO# 93154 )

Business Address:
Polyclinic Specialty Medicine
2 Champagne Drive
Unit B17
Toronto ON  M3J 2C5
Phone Number: (416) 222-6160

Business Address:
Suite 19
1118 Centre Street
Thornhill ON  L4J 7R9
Phone Number: (905) 479-9902

Business Address:
Suite 302
3420 Hurontario Street
Mississauga ON  L5B 4A9

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 21 Sep 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEVEN ROSTISLAV ORLOV may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ORLOV is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014