Orovec, Natalie Marija (CPSO#: 72417)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Dec 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Dec 2002

Summary

Former Name: Orovec, Natalie (used until: 04 Dec 2002 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
9 Lake Ave. S
Stoney Creek ON  L8G 2V1
Phone: (905) 664-9992
Fax: (905) 664-9910
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

McMaster Children's Hospital
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Canada
Phone: (905) 521-5030
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: N. Orovec Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 24 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Orovec ( CPSO# 72417 )

Business Address:
McMaster Children's Hospital
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 521-5030

Business Address:
9 Lake Avenue South
Stoney Creek ON  L8G 2V1
Phone Number: (905) 664-9992

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Nov 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NATALIE MARIJA OROVEC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OROVEC is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Nov 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Nov 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Dec 2002