Orpin, John Alexander (CPSO#: 22454)

Current Status: Revoked: Discipline Committee as of 20 Feb 1989

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Glasgow, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Oct 1966
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Nov 1969
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 20 Feb 1989

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 12 Aug 1987
Summary:

 In August 1987, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Orpin guilty of professional misconduct, as 
 defined in s. 27(29) of Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, in that he committed sexual 
 impropriety with a patient.  Consequently, the Committee ordered that Dr. Orpin(s licence to 
 practice be revoked.

Appeal: Appeal Dismissed
Appeal Decision Date: 24 Nov 1988
Hearing Date(s): 10 Aug 1987