Orr, Christine Jane (CPSO#: 93253)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Mar 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Division of Endocrinology
Health Sciences Centre
300 Prince Phillip Drive
St. John's NL
St. John's NL  A1C3V6
Phone: (709) 777-8027
Fax: 709-777-8035

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Newfoundland and Labrador

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 21 Sep 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTINE JANE ORR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ORR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Mar 2015