Orth, Peter Marius Randle (CPSO#: 93637)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Highway 105
P O Box 311
Red Lake ON  P0V 2M0
Phone: (807) 727-2617
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Peter Orth Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 28 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Orth ( CPSO# 93637 )

Business Address:
Red Lake Medical Associates
Highway 105
PO Box 311
Red Lake ON  P0V 2M0
Phone Number: (807) 727-2617

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Red Lake Margaret Cochenour Memorial Hospital Red Lake
Sioux Lookout,Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PETER MARIUS RANDLE ORTH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ORTH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2012